LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2011 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB05448
Action History
CT
Connecticut House Bill HB05448
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2011 Regular Session
Connecticut House Bill HB05448
Action History
02/16/2011
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
02/15/2011
Drafted by Committee
02/08/2011
Vote to Draft
01/28/2011
Public Hearing 02/03
01/26/2011
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing