|
07/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Public Act 11-244
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 644
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 8196
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule A 7148
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Bill Passed Temporarily
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
House Designated House Amendment Schedule A 7148
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/28/2011
|
File Number 237
|
|
|
|
03/28/2011
|
House Calendar Number 148
|
|
|
|
03/28/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/01/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|
|
02/28/2011
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/22
|
|
|