07/08/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
06/24/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
06/20/2011 | Public Act 11-96 | |||
06/07/2011 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |||
06/07/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
05/27/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 566 | |||
05/27/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/25/2011 | House Passed | |||
04/07/2011 | File Number 474 | |||
04/07/2011 | House Calendar Number 270 | |||
04/07/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/07/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/01/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/25/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/23/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/17/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development | |||
03/16/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
03/09/2011 | Vote to Draft | |||
02/10/2011 | Public Hearing 02/14 | |||
01/28/2011 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |