LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2011 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB05597
Action History
CT
Connecticut House Bill HB05597
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2011 Regular Session
Connecticut House Bill HB05597
Action History
03/14/2011
Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
03/14/2011
Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
03/07/2011
Change of Reference Appropriations
02/02/2011
Public Hearing 02/07
01/28/2011
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
01/20/2011
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development