05/04/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/29/2011 | File Number 268 | |||
03/29/2011 | House Calendar Number 165 | |||
03/29/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/29/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/23/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/15/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/14/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/07/2011 | Public Hearing 03/11 | |||
02/16/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | |||
02/15/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
01/31/2011 | Vote to Draft |