02/10/2011 | Public Hearing 02/15 | |||
02/09/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |||
02/08/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
02/08/2011 | Vote to Draft | |||
01/31/2011 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |||
01/31/2011 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |||
01/31/2011 | Change of Reference Labor and Public Employees | |||
01/20/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |