|
07/08/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Public Act 11-97
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
File Number 896
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 629
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8182
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
File Number 269
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
House Calendar Number 166
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
02/25/2011
|
Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/23
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|