04/27/2011 | File Number 644 | |||
04/27/2011 | House Calendar Number 374 | |||
04/27/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/27/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/20/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/15/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/14/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/22/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |||
02/18/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary | |||
02/15/2011 | Joint Favorable JUD | |||
02/04/2011 | Public Hearing 02/08 | |||
02/03/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children | |||
02/01/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
02/01/2011 | Vote to Draft |