04/06/2011 | File Number 402 | |||
04/06/2011 | House Calendar Number 247 | |||
04/06/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/06/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/31/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/23/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/22/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/03 | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology | |||
02/23/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
02/03/2011 | Vote to Draft |