03/17/2011 | File Number 82 | |||
03/17/2011 | House Calendar Number 64 | |||
03/17/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/17/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/11/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/03/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/03/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/02/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law | |||
03/01/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
02/24/2011 | Vote to Draft | |||
02/16/2011 | Public Hearing 02/22 |