|
05/20/2011
|
File Number 824
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 531
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,D
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule D 6530
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 6515
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 6480
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6130
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
File Number 83
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
House Calendar Number 65
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/11/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/01/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|
|
02/28/2011
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/22
|
|
|