04/27/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/27/2011 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
04/27/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/27/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/27/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/21/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
04/13/2011 | File Number 516 | |||
04/13/2011 | House Calendar Number 309 | |||
04/13/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/07/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/22/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health | |||
03/21/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health | |||
03/15/2011 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Public Health | |||
03/08/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | |||
03/07/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
03/03/2011 | Vote to Draft | |||
02/18/2011 | Public Hearing 02/24 | |||
02/01/2011 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |