04/07/2011 | File Number 477 | |||
04/07/2011 | House Calendar Number 273 | |||
04/07/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/07/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/01/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/25/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/23/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/22/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development | |||
03/21/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
03/09/2011 | Vote to Draft | |||
02/28/2011 | Public Hearing 03/04 | |||
02/09/2011 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |