04/13/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/13/2011 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
04/13/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/13/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/13/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/06/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
03/31/2011 | File Number 315 | |||
03/31/2011 | House Calendar Number 188 | |||
03/31/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/25/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/07/2011 | Public Hearing 03/11 | |||
03/04/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | |||
03/03/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
02/14/2011 | Vote to Draft | |||
02/03/2011 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health | |||
02/03/2011 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health | |||
02/01/2011 | Change of Reference Public Health | |||
01/25/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |