|
06/03/2011
|
File Number 895
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 637
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6744
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
File Number 785
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/10/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
File Number 177
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
House Calendar Number 114
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/08/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
|
02/22/2011
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Commerce
|
|
|
|
02/04/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/10
|
|
|
|
01/25/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|