05/24/2011 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
05/24/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/24/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/24/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/23/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/20/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
05/18/2011 | No New File by Committee on Education | |||
05/10/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Education | |||
04/27/2011 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/21/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/07/2011 | File Number 479 | |||
04/07/2011 | House Calendar Number 275 | |||
04/07/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/01/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/22/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/18/2011 | Public Hearing 03/22 | |||
03/16/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services | |||
03/15/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
02/04/2011 | Vote to Draft |