06/03/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/31/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/25/2011 | Public Act 11-36 | |||
05/20/2011 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |||
05/20/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
05/20/2011 | Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule A 6184 | |||
05/19/2011 | Matter Pass Retained | |||
05/19/2011 | Designated Only Senate Amendment Schedule A 6184 | |||
03/18/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 101 | |||
03/18/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/16/2011 | House Passed | |||
03/07/2011 | File Number 34 | |||
03/07/2011 | House Calendar Number 40 | |||
03/07/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/07/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/28/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/07/11 10:00 AM | |||
02/25/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/24/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/02/2011 | Public Hearing 02/10 | |||
01/25/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |