|
07/08/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Special Act 11-8
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
File Number 894
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 636
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7605
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
File Number 382
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
House Calendar Number 230
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
|
02/25/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/02
|
|
|
|
01/31/2011
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|