04/07/2011 | File Number 480 | |||
04/07/2011 | House Calendar Number 276 | |||
04/07/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/07/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/01/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/25/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/23/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/17/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
03/16/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
03/15/2011 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Planning and Development | |||
02/10/2011 | Public Hearing 02/15 | |||
02/09/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security | |||
02/08/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
02/03/2011 | Vote to Draft |