|
07/08/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Public Act 11-102
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
File Number 814
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 521
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5316
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
File Number 194
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
House Calendar Number 130
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/18/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/08/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/15
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
|
02/08/2011
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
|
02/03/2011
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|