|
07/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Public Act 11-192
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 567
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
House Passed
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
File Number 555
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
House Calendar Number 333
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
01/27/2011
|
Public Hearing 01/31
|
|
|
|
01/26/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|