04/06/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/06/2011 | No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security | |||
04/06/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/06/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/05/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/29/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Public Safety and Security | |||
03/22/2011 | File Number 140 | |||
03/22/2011 | House Calendar Number 93 | |||
03/22/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/15/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 5:00 PM | |||
02/01/2011 | Public Hearing 02/09 | |||
01/26/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |