|
07/01/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Public Act 11-59
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
File Number 860
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 572
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 5418
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5430
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
File Number 92
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
House Calendar Number 75
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
01/27/2011
|
Public Hearing 01/31
|
|
|
|
01/26/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|