04/06/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
03/22/2011 | File Number 141 | |||
03/22/2011 | House Calendar Number 94 | |||
03/22/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/22/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/16/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/11/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/10/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/04/2011 | Public Hearing 02/10 | |||
01/26/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |