|
07/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Public Act 11-193
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
File Number 880
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 610
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7427
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
File Number 549
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
House Calendar Number 334
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Joint Favorable PH
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/22
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Children
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
|
02/01/2011
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|