03/22/2011 | File Number 142 | |||
03/22/2011 | House Calendar Number 95 | |||
03/22/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/22/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/16/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/11/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/10/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/22/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services | |||
02/18/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services | |||
02/15/2011 | Joint Favorable HS | |||
01/28/2011 | Public Hearing 02/03 | |||
01/27/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |