03/18/2011 | File Number 89 | |||
03/18/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 99 | |||
03/18/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/16/2011 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |||
03/16/2011 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4754 | |||
03/01/2011 | File Number 21 | |||
03/01/2011 | House Calendar Number 33 | |||
03/01/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/01/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/23/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/28/11 5:00 PM | |||
02/15/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/10/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
01/28/2011 | Public Hearing 02/01 | |||
01/27/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |