|
07/08/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Public Act 11-106
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
File Number 674
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 409
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 5112
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
Bill Passed Temporarily
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4762
|
|
|
|
03/01/2011
|
File Number 22
|
|
|
|
03/01/2011
|
House Calendar Number 34
|
|
|
|
03/01/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
02/23/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/28/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
01/28/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/01
|
|
|
|
01/27/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|