03/22/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/10/2011 | File Number 53 | |||
03/10/2011 | House Calendar Number 52 | |||
03/10/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/10/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/04/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/09/11 5:00 PM | |||
02/23/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/22/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
01/28/2011 | Public Hearing 02/01 | |||
01/27/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |