07/13/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
06/30/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
06/28/2011 | Public Act 11-196 | |||
06/08/2011 | In Concurrence | |||
06/08/2011 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |||
06/08/2011 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |||
05/27/2011 | File Number 853 | |||
05/27/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 562 | |||
05/27/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/25/2011 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |||
05/25/2011 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7117 | |||
03/14/2011 | File Number 68 | |||
03/14/2011 | House Calendar Number 59 | |||
03/14/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/14/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/07/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/11 10:00 AM | |||
02/25/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/24/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
01/28/2011 | Public Hearing 02/01 | |||
01/27/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |