|
07/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Public Act 11-245
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 8707
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Potential Disagreeing Action, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8598
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
File Number 848
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 556
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6526
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
File Number 36
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
House Calendar Number 42
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
02/28/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/07/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
01/28/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/03
|
|
|
|
01/27/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
|
|
|