04/12/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/04/2011 | File Number 350 | |||
04/04/2011 | House Calendar Number 205 | |||
04/04/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/04/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/28/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/18/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/17/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/03 | |||
01/31/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |