05/25/2011 | No New File by Committee on General Law | |||
05/25/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/25/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/25/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/25/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/19/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on General Law | |||
03/18/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 103 | |||
03/16/2011 | House Passed | |||
03/07/2011 | File Number 37 | |||
03/07/2011 | House Calendar Number 43 | |||
03/07/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
02/28/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/07/11 10:00 AM | |||
02/04/2011 | Public Hearing 02/09 | |||
01/31/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |