|
07/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Public Act 11-197
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 555
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
House Passed
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
File Number 760
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
House Calendar Number 453
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/04/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
03/18/2011
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/28
|
|
|
|
02/23/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
|
02/22/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Transportation
|
|
|
|
02/03/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/10
|
|
|
|
01/31/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|