04/18/2011 | File Number 550 | |||
04/18/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/18/2011 | New File by Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/18/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/11/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/11 10:00 AM | |||
04/06/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/05/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/22/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/17/2011 | File Number 84 | |||
03/17/2011 | House Calendar Number 67 | |||
03/17/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/11/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/03/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/17/2011 | Public Hearing 02/24 | |||
02/01/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |