04/12/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/21/2011 | File Number 98 | |||
03/21/2011 | House Calendar Number 76 | |||
03/21/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/21/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/14/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/03/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/03/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/17/2011 | Public Hearing 02/24 | |||
02/01/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |