|
07/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Public Act 11-250
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 647
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6379
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
File Number 649
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/27/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
04/19/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/01/2011
|
File Number 23
|
|
|
|
03/01/2011
|
House Calendar Number 35
|
|
|
|
03/01/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
02/23/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/28/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
02/02/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/08
|
|
|
|
02/01/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|