05/24/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/20/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/18/2011 | Public Act 11-13 | |||
05/12/2011 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |||
05/12/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
04/29/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 424 | |||
04/29/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/27/2011 | House Passed | |||
04/19/2011 | File Number 581 | |||
04/19/2011 | House Calendar Number 344 | |||
04/19/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/19/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/13/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/07/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/07/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/24/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
02/22/2011 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
02/02/2011 | Public Hearing 02/08 | |||
02/01/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |