07/08/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
06/24/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
06/21/2011 | Public Act 11-108 | |||
06/07/2011 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |||
06/07/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
05/09/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 474 | |||
05/09/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/05/2011 | House Passed | |||
04/18/2011 | File Number 543 | |||
04/18/2011 | House Calendar Number 335 | |||
04/18/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/18/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/11/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/31/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/30/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/04/2011 | Public Hearing 03/09 | |||
02/03/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |