|
07/08/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Public Act 11-109
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 596
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
House Passed
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
File Number 143
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
House Calendar Number 96
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
02/22/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Joint Favorable HS
|
|
|
|
02/04/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/08
|
|
|
|
02/03/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Children
|
|
|