04/19/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/19/2011 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
04/19/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/18/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/18/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/12/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
03/29/2011 | File Number 273 | |||
03/29/2011 | House Calendar Number 170 | |||
03/29/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/23/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 5:00 PM | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |||
02/04/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Banks |