04/27/2011 | File Number 645 | |||
04/27/2011 | House Calendar Number 375 | |||
04/27/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/27/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/20/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/18/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
04/18/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/01/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
02/28/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
02/24/2011 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
02/10/2011 | Public Hearing 02/17 | |||
02/04/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |