|
04/27/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Public Act 11-1
|
|
|
|
04/16/2011
|
Signed by Governor in Original
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 316
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
House Passed
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
File Number 497
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
House Calendar Number 300
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/18
|
|
|
|
02/04/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|