04/06/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/28/2011 | File Number 241 | |||
03/28/2011 | House Calendar Number 152 | |||
03/28/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/28/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/21/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/11/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/07/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/14/2011 | Public Hearing 02/18 | |||
02/04/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |