04/21/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/28/2011 | File Number 242 | |||
03/28/2011 | House Calendar Number 153 | |||
03/28/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/28/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/21/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/15/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/15/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/17/2011 | Public Hearing 02/24 | |||
02/04/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |