06/03/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/31/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/25/2011 | Public Act 11-37 | |||
05/20/2011 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |||
05/20/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
04/29/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 414 | |||
04/29/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/27/2011 | House Passed | |||
03/23/2011 | File Number 179 | |||
03/23/2011 | House Calendar Number 116 | |||
03/23/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/23/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/17/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/11/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/10/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/17/2011 | Public Hearing 02/24 | |||
02/04/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |