|
06/03/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Public Act 11-38
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
File Number 675
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 419
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5566
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
File Number 318
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
House Calendar Number 191
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/22
|
|
|
|
02/08/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|