03/21/2011 | File Number 101 | |||
03/21/2011 | House Calendar Number 80 | |||
03/21/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/21/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/14/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/03/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/02/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/18/2011 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |||
02/09/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |