05/11/2011 | File Number 787 | |||
05/11/2011 | House Calendar Number 474 | |||
05/11/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/11/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/05/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/10/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/26/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/25/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
04/01/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/31/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/25/2011 | Joint Favorable APP | |||
03/22/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Education | |||
03/21/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Education | |||
03/15/2011 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Education | |||
02/10/2011 | Public Hearing 02/17 | |||
02/09/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |