LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2011 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB06322
Action History
CT
Connecticut House Bill HB06322
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2011 Regular Session
Connecticut House Bill HB06322
Action History
03/29/2011
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
03/28/2011
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
03/25/2011
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
03/23/2011
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
03/22/2011
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations
02/10/2011
Public Hearing 02/14
02/09/2011
Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services